NORTH CLWYD ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of the charity is to take in unwanted and stray animals, care for them to the best of our ability and rehome them to responsible people. We also promote responsible pet ownership through local schools, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£908,091
Donations and legacies | £347.64k | |
Charitable activities | £65.04k | |
Other trading activities | £493.75k | |
Investments | £1.66k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,107,761
Raising funds | £279.89k | |
Charitable activities | £827.87k | |
Other | £0 |
£322,256 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £18,474 from 3 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £279.89k | |
Charitable expenditure | £827.87k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £279.89k | |
Charitable expenditure | £827.87k | |
Retained for future use | £122.59k |
People

35 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Wirral
- Wrexham
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Owen | Chair | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Horton | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Bailey | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paco Lock | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Lock | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Jones | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Hodnett | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nia Cooke | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Roberts | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Hobbs | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Davies | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
J STUART GAWNE | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR R N OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE DENISE OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.42m | £1.28m | £997.97k | £1.12m | £908.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £913.73k | £814.48k | £837.88k | £977.86k | £1.11m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.45k | £13.02k | £8.00k | £15.83k | £18.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £217.81k | £258.12k | £21.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £933.76k | £931.23k | £607.48k | £552.55k | £347.64k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £388.98k | £268.01k | £328.97k | £484.56k | £493.75k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £92.76k | £73.11k | £60.66k | £76.70k | £65.04k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £665 | £203 | £358 | £3.05k | £1.66k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.51k | £7.32k | £504 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £825.63k | £75.25k | £195.79k | £372.33k | £181.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £678.70k | £626.55k | £633.89k | £731.25k | £827.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £235.03k | £187.93k | £203.99k | £246.61k | £279.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.29k | £18.39k | £13.08k | £11.46k | £11.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £719.44k | £1.74m | £1.28m | £1.25m | £1.05m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £363 | £610.32k | £596.58k | £415 | |
|
Other assets | £1.04m | £471.79k | £582.47k | £701.85k | £1.51m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £246.82k | £226.54k | £328.61k | £268.08k | £153.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MAY 1984
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF KINDNESS AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, SHELTER AND VETERINARY TREATMENT FOR ALL ABANDONED AND SICK ANIMALS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAES GWYN
TRELOGAN
HOLYWELL
CH8 9BD
- Phone:
- 01745560546
- Email:
- reception@ncar.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window