Trustees NORTH CLWYD ANIMAL RESCUE
Charity number: 515195

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Owen | Chair | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Horton | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Bailey | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paco Lock | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Lock | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Jones | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Hodnett | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nia Cooke | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Roberts | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Hobbs | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Davies | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
J STUART GAWNE | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR R N OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE DENISE OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.