FRIENDS OF ROSENDALE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the welfare and education of the children, families and staff at Rosendale Primary School SE21
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lambeth
Governance
- 20 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca KENDALL | Chair | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Harris | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholette Girdler | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phil Harris | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Clark | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Browne | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Bojanowska | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Marie Pastore | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Wollaston | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carly Ellen Hardman | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Patel Buglass | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Thornton Rodway | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.12k | £24.27k | £51.88k | £76.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.46k | £32.03k | £34.67k | £81.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROSENDALE PRIMARY SCHOOL
ROSENDALE ROAD
LONDON
SE21 8LR
- Phone:
- 02086704962
- Email:
- rosendalepta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window