Trustees FRIENDS OF ROSENDALE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity Number: 1186474

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca KENDALL | Chair | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Harris | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholette Girdler | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phil Harris | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Clark | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Browne | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Bojanowska | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Marie Pastore | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Wollaston | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carly Ellen Hardman | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Patel Buglass | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Thornton Rodway | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.