IGBO WOMEN COMMUNITY (IWC) GREATER MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote Igbo language, art, culture and heritage as a means of promoting social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society. To relieve and combat poverty, distress, financial hardship, and sickness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHIDINMA OKENYEKA | Chair | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ogechukwu OPARA-NADI | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNA IFEOMA OKEKE | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.21k | £11.42k | £2.80k | £2.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £650 | £9.07k | £4.96k | £2.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE; A. TO RELIEVE AND COMBAT POVERTY, DISTRESS, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, AND SICKNESS; B. THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, UNEMPLOYMENT OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, SUPPORT AND NETWORKING OPPORTUNITIES. C. TO PROMOTE IGBO ART, CULTURE AND HERITAGE AS A MEANS OF PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. D. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN IGBO CULTURE AND LANGUAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 PETERCHURCH WALK
OPENSHAW
MANCHESTER
M11 2LQ
- Phone:
- 07529364268
- Email:
- chidinmaokenyeka@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window