KRIO DESCENDANTS UNION UK AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Education and promoting awareness of the Krio culture and heritage - Participatory experiences through workshops, classes, dramatisation, lectures and exhibitions. -Documenting and showcasing distinctive Krio historic or cultural practices relating to Language etc. -Health promotion and advice- outreach and clinics. -Fundraising events to raise funds for the work of KDU UK & Ireland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 14 April 2020: CIO registration
- KDU UK AND IRELAND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellen Samuels | Chair | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marionette Sheila Gilpin | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jesse Hamelberg | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Anthony Beresford Lusanie | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Madeline Val-Macauley | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harolda Williams-Babin | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Velma Seraphina Ayodele Tobun | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ramatu Adisa-Sesay | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Benjamin | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|||||
GEORGE WILSON | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kayode Ronald Adesimi Robbin-Coker | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvette Erritan John | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Genevieve Juma | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.92k | £4.14k | £11.40k | £17.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £885 | £890 | £9.40k | £8.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURE AND HISTORY OF THE KRIO PEOPLE OF SIERRA LEONE. (2) THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN FREETOWN, SIERRA LEONE, BY THE PROVISION OF HEALTH OUTREACH PROGRAMMES THAT CONSIST OF HEALTH AWARENESS SESSIONS/TALKS IN THE AREAS OF BASIC HYGIENE, NUTRITION, DISEASE PREVENTION, HIV, SEXUAL HEALTH AND PREGNANCY THAT ARE DELIVERED BY REGISTERED HEALTH PRACTITIONERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 Northview
SWANLEY
Kent
BR8 7BG
- Phone:
- 07771752911
- Email:
- Alstyne50@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window