UK AMBASSADORS FOR CHRIST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
organize mission conference, holding small group meeting and provide discipleship training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Yong Wang Deng | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dakun Wang | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kwok Choi Ng | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.74k | £94.04k | £52.30k | £145.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.39k | £46.80k | £77.00k | £131.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAY 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, CONFERENCES, SEMINARS, SHORT STAY RETREATS, PASTORAL CARE AND CARRYING OUT OUTREACH WORK IN THE COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Union House
111 New Union Street
CV1 2NT
- Phone:
- 07963883265
- Email:
- info@ukafc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window