KIDNEY DISEASE PREVENTION SIERRA LEONE (KDPSL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE KIDNEY DISEASE PREVENTION AND SUPPORT CIO IS: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SIERRA LEONE AND THE UK AMONG PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH, OR ARE LIKELY TO CONTRACT, KIDNEY DISEASE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 16 June 2020: CIO registration
- KIDNEY DISEASE PREVENTION SIERRA LEONE (Working name)
- KIDNEY DISEASE PREVENTION AND SUPPORT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bintu Bangura | Chair | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
FINDA KAMARA | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aminata Jalloh | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr MARTIN LESLIE FORD | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £880 | £110 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £957 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jun 2020 as amended on 25 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE KIDNEY DISEASE PREVENTION AND SUPPORT CIO IS: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SIERRA LEONE AND THE UK AMONG PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH, OR ARE LIKELY TO CONTRACT, KIDNEY DISEASE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH: ? • THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION TO HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN CLINICAL BEST PRACTICE IN THE FIELD OF KIDNEY DISEASE; • THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION ON KIDNEY DISEASE, PREVENTATIVE PRACTICES, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF KIDNEY DISEASE FOLLOWING DIAGNOSIS; • PROVIDING SUPPORT TO ACCESS APPROPRIATE MEDICAL TREATMENT FOR KIDNEY DISEASE PATIENTS; • PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO KIDNEY DISEASE, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Eynsford House
9 Lovelinch Close
LONDON
SE15 1HD
- Phone:
- 02076350136
- Email:
- info@kdpsl.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window