Accounts and annual returns GRACE CHILDRENS MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1191573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 17 March 2023 27 August 2024 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 March 2023 27 August 2024 223 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 17 March 2022 15 February 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 March 2022 15 February 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window