GRACE CHILDRENS MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1191573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We seek donations from the general public in order to purchase resources for our local partners in India who care for orphans

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 17 March 2024

Total income: £26,425
Total expenditure: £26,425

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Benjamin Coates BSc PgCert Chair 10 October 2015
None on record
Karlo Baker Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Yuen Lun Wong Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Bernard Boateng Mr Trustee 10 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/03/2022 17/03/2023 17/03/2024
Total gross income £7.44k £10.66k £26.43k
Total expenditure £1.20k £600 £26.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 17 March 2023 27 August 2024 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 March 2023 27 August 2024 223 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 17 March 2022 15 February 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 March 2022 15 February 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
62 Newcastle Avenue
COLCHESTER
CO3 9XL
Phone:
07707 686683