THE SILENT HORN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Silent Horn Foundation raises funds both online and in the UK for people who are Deaf and Hard of hearing with a focus on supporting the most vulnerable communities in the Horn of Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samira Abdullahi Duale | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leyla Muhiddin Jeilani | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Burr | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sahra Farah | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hana Abdullahi Duale | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £200 | £976 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £46 | £729 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE, IN THE HORN OF AFRICA AND IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING RESOURCES FOR USE IN SCHOOLS, INCLUDING EQUIPMENT, HEARING AIDS AND SPEECH-TO-TEXT AIDS AND DELIVERING SIGN LANGUAGE; AND 1.1.2 TO RELIEVE NEED, INCLUDING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, AMONG DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE, IN THE HORN OF AFRICA AND IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SIGN LANGUAGE SUPPORT AND EMPLOYABILITY TRAINING. 1.2 THE "HORN OF AFRICA" COMPRISES SOMALIA, DJIBOUTI, ETHIOPIA, KENYA AND ERITREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Silent Horn Foundatoon
3rd Floor
86-90 Paul Street
London
EC2A 4NA
- Phone:
- 07704600459
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window