HOPE4KIBERA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hope4Kibera supports local partners in the Kibera slum, Nairobi, Kenya. The principle activity is to support our partners in running the Bright Hope Education Centre, which is a secondary school (boarding) offering free education to students from the Kibera slum. Our partners also assist needy Kibera families with food and medical care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
Governance
- 14 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Charles Henry Collins | Chair | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Raffell | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARION COLLINS | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Workman | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Deborah Wynne | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.33k | £24.55k | £43.26k | £88.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.93k | £29.16k | £31.54k | £95.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, TO BE UNDERTAKEN IN KIBERA, NAIROBI AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREAFTER REFERRED TO AS ‘THE AREA OF BENEFIT’), ARE THE FOLLOWING: A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE BRIGHT HOPE EDUCATION CENTRE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. B) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAWTHORN COTTAGE
FLOWER STREET
WOODBURY
EXETER
EX5 1LX
- Phone:
- 07541800660
- Email:
- admin@hope4kibera.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window