MOUNT TABOR APOSTOLIC CHURCH(MTAC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Object of the CIO is to advance the Christian Religion in accordance with the Christian Faith, primarily but not exclusively within Chesterfield and the surrounding area. Activities includes: - Educating people about religion; engaging in Missionary& Evangelical work; Pastoral care & Outreach; Blessings & Solemnisation of Marriages; Baby Blessings; Funeral Services, Prayers and Blessings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 21 November 2019: CIO registration
- BETHEL APOSTOLIC LIFE CHURCH INTL(ALC) (Working name)
- APOSTOLIC LIFE CHURCH INTL(ALC) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elder Donovan Modest | Chair | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Missionary Jennifer Ann Ffrench | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rose Gordon | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Minister Errol Swaby | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Dwaine Richards | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Evangelist Delores Modest | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Grace Ffrench | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £590 | £3.60k | £2.90k | £4.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £459 | £3.38k | £3.04k | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON DATED 21 NOV 2019 AMENDED TO CIO ASSOCIATION 28 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN CHESTERFIELD AND SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
189 GREENHILL AVENUE
SHEFFIELD
S8 7TJ
- Phone:
- 07478212611
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window