THE DANIELLA LOGUN FOUNDATION (DLF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer holistic wellbeing support to Children and Young People diagnosed with brain tumours, other cancers and their families from the point of diagnosis onwards. 1:1 & Group Support - in-person & remotely Emotional Support - listening & counselling Spiritual Support - chaplaincy & pastoral care Practical Support - help with meetings, paperwork, letters, forms etc S.E.N.D Support Advocacy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
- Islington
Governance
- 02 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Logun-Leko | Chair | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ngozi Oketah | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adeboye Ifederu | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kelechi Mgbor | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.49k | £19.70k | £14.46k | £54.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.18k | £16.40k | £16.32k | £49.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH BRAIN TUMOURS AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH EMOTIONAL SUPPORT, TALKING THERAPIES AND PEER SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES CARING FOR OR RECENTLY BEREAVED THROUGH CHILDHOOD BRAIN TUMOURS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Boundary House
Cricketfield Road
UXBRIDGE
Middlesex
UB8 1QG
- Phone:
- 07760411888
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window