SYDENHAM COMMUNITY CLUB (LEAMINGTON SPA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity events such as raising money via sports events, raffles, social engagements
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 February 2020: CIO registration
- SYDENHAM COMMUNITY CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Narrinder Sahota | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DALJIT PUREWAL | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
BALJIT SAHOTA | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.18k | £147.77k | £166.75k | £146.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.62k | £155.85k | £164.95k | £147.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.67k | £22.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SYDENHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
207 CHESTERTON DRIVE
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV31 1YJ
- Phone:
- 01926730627
- Email:
- Joogy1@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window