THE WILBRAHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Christian religion in accordance with the practices and beliefs of the Church of England including without prejudice to the foregoing, the provision of monies and of residential accomodation for the clergy for the time being of the parish of Odd Rode, Rode Heath, Cheshire. The promotion of such other charitable purposes as the trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 21 June 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lady Anne BAKER WILBRAHAM | Chair | 05 April 1984 |
|
|
||||
RANDLE BAKER WILBRAHAM | Trustee | 05 April 1984 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.15k | £3.22k | £3.66k | £5.02k | £5.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.47k | £1.87k | £4.07k | £4.47k | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5/04/1984
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRACTICES AND BELIEF OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MONIES AND OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR THE CLERGY FOR THE TIME BEING OF ODD RODE, RODE HEATH CHESHIRE THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
ODD RODE, RODE HEATH CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
RODE HALL FARM HOUSE
SCHOLAR GREEN
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST7 3QW
- Phone:
- 01270877784
- Email:
- info@geens.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window