THE R J WESTON DUFFIELD CHARITY

Charity number: 1188669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The RJ Weston Duffield Charity exists to relieve the charitable needs of older persons in Duffield and the surrounding area in particular by the provision of a day centre. The day centre is in Tamworth Street, Duffield and is called The Weston Centre.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £32,261
Total expenditure: £43,377

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Zydzienowski Chair 14 March 2022
None on record
Kathryn Anne Busman Trustee 01 August 2024
DUFFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Bernadette Roberts Trustee 17 April 2024
BELPER & DISTRICT U3A
Received: On time
Robert Crowder Trustee 30 June 2023
None on record
Barry Ashley Clarke Trustee 28 June 2022
None on record
Sandra Jacqueline Zydzienowski Trustee 23 May 2022
None on record
Janet Patricia Thompson Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £92.40k £24.80k £39.67k £32.26k
Total expenditure £17.36k £47.18k £40.37k £43.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.96k £17.34k £7.89k £800

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT PROBATE REGISTRY ON 27 JANUARY 1960 AND SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEED DATED 23 FEBRUARY 1987 AND 18 JANUARY 1999. as amended on 09 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AD DAY CENTRE FOR AGED RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH WHO WOULD IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES BENEFIT FROM USE OF THE DAY CENTRE AND WHO HAVE ATTAINED THE AGE OF AT LEAST 60 YEARS OR HAVE RETIRED UNDER THAT AGE ON THE GROUND OF ILL HEALTH OR FROM OCCUPATIONS WHERE RETIREMENT UNDER THE AGE OF 60 YEARS IS NORMAL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSES 3, 4, 5 & 6 OF THE DEED)
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF DUFFIELD
Registration history
  • 27 February 1987 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The RJ Weston Duffield Charity
The Weston Centre
Tamworth Street
Duffield
Belper
Derbyshi
Phone:
01332840349