JACOBS WELL APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A CHRISTIAN CHARITY THAT RAISES FUNDS AND COLLECTS SUPPLIES, OFTEN RECYCLED, TO SEND ABROAD, GIVING VOLUNTEERS NEW OPPORTUNITIES AND EXPERIENCES. 1) IN W. AFRICA WE ARE SUPPORTING SCHOOLS, HOSPITALS AND CLINICS TO MAINTAIN AND DEVELOP SERVICES. 2) IN MOLDOVA, UKRAINE, AFGHANISTAN AND KENYA AND DISASTER AREAS WE SUPPLY HUMANITARIAN AID 3) WE PROVIDE REHABILITATION HOUSING IN ROMANIA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Albania
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Moldova
- Pakistan
- Romania
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Ukraine
Governance
- 20 July 1984: Standard registration
- 03 February 2017: Funds received from 1127107 ABC CHILDRENS AID
- JACOBS WELL (Working name)
- JACOB'S WELL APPEAL (Previous name)
- JACOB'S WELL POLISH APPEAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher William Blackburn | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Wendy Moore | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne Ribey | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lyle | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Betty Luciola | Trustee | 03 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR BERYL BEYNON OBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.52m | £2.87m | £7.21m | £84.98k | £8.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.46m | £2.80m | £7.88m | £1.07m | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £58.57k | £16.52k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £413.11k | £2.78m | £7.09m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12.93k | £91.01k | £101.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.10m | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.50k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £19.90k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £220.46k | £2.99k | £17.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.29m | £2.65m | £7.71m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £73.37k | £65.86k | £72.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.97k | £0 | £3.71k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £102.79k | £91.24k | £95.68k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APRIL 1984 AS AMENDED 5 OCTOBER 1987 AND 20 JUNE 1991 AS AMENDED 29 JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
A. TO RELIEVE NEED, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN EASTERN EUROPE, THE MIDDLE EAST, ASIA OR AFRICA AND TO ASSIST PERSONS IN NEED OF EMERGENCY DISASTER RELIEF WHEREVER THEY MAY BE. B. TO RELIEVE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF THOSE PERSONS RESIDENT IN BEVERLEY AND DISTRICT WHO ARE HANDICAPPED. C. TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. D. TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT MEDICAL RESEARCH AND FACILITATE THE WORK OF RESEARCHERS OF WHICH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH WILL BE MADE PUBLICLY AVAILABLE. E. TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND AND FACILITATE TEACHING
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jacobs Well Appeal
Swinemoor Lane
BEVERLEY
HU17 0JX
- Phone:
- 01482 881162
- Email:
- office@jacobswellappeal.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window