THE FRIENDS OF THE SCRUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The conservation and improvement of the Scrubs and the protection of its use by walkers, dog walkers, pony riders, botanists, bird and butterfly watchers and other members of the public in an environment that is more wild than tamed; the protection of its use by kite and model aircraft flyers, games players and children in designated areas; the education of the public about the Scrubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 23 December 2019: CIO registration
- THE FRIENDS OF WORMWOOD SCRUBS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Stephen Waley-Cohen Bt | Chair | 29 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Joaquim Pereira | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Sarah Abrahart | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Benjamin Novak | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rebecca Emma Ranson | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Eleanor Faye Thomas | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Sarah Cynthia Charlotte Johnson | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Smita Dave | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Carmel Bridget McLoughlin | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.15k | £12.00k | £2.03k | £1.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.15k | £3.43k | £2.25k | £1.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Dec 2019 as amended on 06 Oct 2020 as amended on 30 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF: (I) THE OPEN SPACE KNOWN AS WORMWOOD SCRUBS ("THE SCRUBS") FOR EXERCISE, RECREATION AND LEISURE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE WORMWOOD SCRUBS ACT 1879 AND OTHER STATUTES AND LAWFUL INSTRUMENTS THAT APPLY TO THE MANAGEMENT AND USE OF THE SCRUBS (II) THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE SCRUBS AND ITS BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF THE SCRUBS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 WALLINGFORD AVENUE
LONDON
W10 6QA
- Phone:
- 02089686268
- Email:
- stephen@swc-office.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window