THE CHARITABLE TRAVEL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to energise and galvanise the travel and tourism industry, and the travelling public, to build The Charitable Travel Fund to provide tangible grant aid for communities in worldwide travel destinations that depend on tourism income but have little support when that income is threatened or extinguished by events beyond expectation or control. In essence our support starts when tourism stops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Aruba
- Barbados
- Belize
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cape Verde
- Chile
- Comoros
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Eswatini
- Ghana
- Grenada
- India
- Indonesia
- Jamaica
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Laos
- Madagascar
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mexico
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Réunion
- Senegal
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Uruguay
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
Governance
- 18 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Smith | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Tilling | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah May Loftus | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven William Thompson | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL LEE | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Kate Louise Haw | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.72k | £13.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £16 | £5.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 January 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 January 2024 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2020
Charitable objects
(A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WORLDWIDE WHERE TOURISM IS SIGNIFICANT TO THE LOCAL ECONOMY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS. (B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, INJURY, DISEASE AND OTHER SUFFERING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WORLDWIDE WHERE TOURISM IS SIGNIFICANT TO THE LOCAL ECONOMY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WORLDWIDE WHERE TOURISM IS SIGNIFICANT TO THE LOCAL ECONOMY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Contingent Works
Broadway Buildings
Elmfield Road
Bromley
Kent
BR1 1LW
- Phone:
- 02030922428
- Email:
- help@charitabletravel.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window