Accounts and annual returns THE BRIGHTER DAYS PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1188194
Charity reporting is overdue by 601 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 November 2023 03 November 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 235 days
Annual return 14 November 2022 03 November 2024 416 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 601 days
Annual return 14 November 2021 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 November 2021 06 January 2023 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 November 2020 11 October 2021 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 November 2020 06 January 2023 479 days late Download Open in new window