THE CHARLIE WATKINS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dormant due to covid Closed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2021 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROTECTING AND PROMOTING THE HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE REDUCTION OF THE INCIDENCE AND SEVERITY OF MENTAL ILLNESS WITH THE AIM OF REDUCING THE NUMBER OF YOUNG PEOPLE TAKING THEIR OWN LIVES (THE PRIMARY OBJECT); AND 1. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE PRIMARY OBJECT, TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES AND ENCOURAGEMENT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO TALK AND TO EXPRESS FEELINGS ASSOCIATED WITH UNHAPPINESS AND MENTAL DISTRESS, AND 2. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE PRIMARY OBJECT, TO ACCELERATE THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING SERVICES TO AND FOR YOUNG PEOPLE; AND 3. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE PRIMARY OBJECT, TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF SUCH MATTERS WITH THE AIM OF REDUCING THE STIGMA SURROUNDING MENTAL ILLNESS, AND 4. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE PRIMARY OBJECT, TO WORK WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO BETTER PROVIDE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE EXPERIENCING MENTAL ILLNESS AND DISTRESS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window