RIDE MENDIPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Protect existing and pursue the opening of new rights of way for off road cyclists. - Construct and maintain sustainable cycling facilities & trails to a high standard. - Act as an information and communication point for local off road cyclists. - Promote a code of conduct among the off road cycling community. - Promote the importance of off road cycling to other user groups & organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 18 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Swanwick | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Drane | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Sheffield | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heath Pimm | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Aaron Lees | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.92k | £35.34k | £6.43k | £218 | |
|
Total expenditure | £908 | £1.12k | £34.14k | £1.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £2.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ON THE MENDIP HILLS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. THE ABOVE OBJECTS WILL BE ACHIEVED BY:- 1. THE PROTECTION OF EXISTING & DEVELOPMENT OF NEW, CYCLING FACILITIES, TRAILS, ROUTES & RIGHTS OF WAY; AND 2. THE PROMOTION OF RESPONSIBLE CYCLING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION & A CODE OF CONDUCT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERNIRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1C Fair Hill
Shipham
WINSCOMBE
Avon
BS25 1TH
- Phone:
- 07771902373
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window