Trustees ILFRACOMBE PILOT GIG CLUB
Charity number: 1187003

Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Ross | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Fuller | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tom Franklin Jeffery | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lowenna Elizabeth Arnold | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael South | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Liversedge | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jake Liversedge | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Dagley | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Thompson | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Waters | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.