THE DELL CHERIAN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation of woodland ecosystems
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 23 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Dell MA , MSc | Chair | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mariam Prema Kumari Dell | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Priya Leela Dell BMus | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mohan Christopher Dell BSc | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £17.60k | £33.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN ENGLAND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PURCHASE, MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF A NATURE RESERVE IN KENT FOR THE PRESERVATION OF BIODIVERSITY AND THE MITIGATION OF CLIMATE CHANGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Watts Avenue
Rochester
ME1 1RZ
- Phone:
- 07903869089
- Email:
- dellichon@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window