ADHD UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are here to help those affected by ADHD. We provide support to, information for and advocate for those affected by ADHD. We build awareness in the general population to increase empathy and understanding. We undertake, and look to fund, meaningful research to improve the lives of those affected by ADHD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neal Mankey | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maxwell Robert Davie | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £49.84k | £122.40k | £251.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £484 | £15.85k | £140.64k | £228.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF INDIVIDUALS WITH ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS, OR SUPPORTERS. TO INCREASE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS. TO SUPPORT, INFORM AND ADVOCATE FOR INDIVIDUALS (AND THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS, OR SUPPORTERS) WITH ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Greek Street
London
W1D 4EG
- Phone:
- 02039849679
- Email:
- hello@adhduk.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window