REDISTRIBUTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Redistribution organises fundraising events in order to raise funds to support the projects and charities we are involved in.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Philippines
- Uganda
Governance
- 05 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Baxter | Chair | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Petra Ester Kahle | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT ENGLAND & WALES AND WORLDWIDE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES (INCLUDING EDUCATION) TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDY RIDGE
FREMANTLE ROAD
BELVEDERE
DA17 6ES
- Phone:
- 07736525984
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window