Trustees BRADNOP VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 515262

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Wilson | Chair | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Lovell | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Dodds | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Butterworth | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Davis | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
NIck Deaville | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo Deaville | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Knott | Trustee | 05 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Berry | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.