THE WOMEN'S CENTRE FOR BLACKBURN AND DISTRICT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 21 June 1984: Standard registration
- 09 August 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 August 2004: Funds transferred to 1100976 LANCASHIRE WOMEN
- THE WOMEN'S CENTRE (Working name)
- THE BLACKBURN AND DISTRICT WELL WOMEN CENTRE COLLECTIVE (Previous name)
- THE BLACKBURN WELL WOMEN CENTRE COLLECTIVE (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 01 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 01 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 24 OCTOBER 1984 AND 1 APRIL 1985 AND 27 OCTOBER 1995 AND 17 NOVEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT WOMEN IN NEED OR DISTRESS IN THE AREA, WHICH IS DEFINED BY REFERENCE TO THE BOUNDARIES OF BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN BOROUGH, HYNDBURN AND RIBBLE VALLEY (A) TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF WOMEN IN THE AREA, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE MEDICAL EXAMINATION. (B) TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE INTERESTS OF WOMEN IN NEED OF HELP AND SUPPORT AND ADVICE ON A RANGE OF ISSUES. (C) TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE FOR WOMEN AND FACILITIES FOR PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN. (D) TO EDUCATE WOMEN IN THE AREA OF THEIR LEGAL RIGHTS AND IN THE AREA OF HEALTH CARE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
BOUNDARIES OF BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN BOROUGH, HYNDBURN AND RIBBLE VALLEY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window