GLOBAL FELLOWSHIP OF CHRISTIAN YOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Global Fellowship is the international network of The Boys' Brigade and kindred organisations. 2. Members of Global Fellowship carry out Christian youth work in around 70 countries of the world. 3. Global Fellowship: a) manages events b) invests in organisations development c) networks and shares news around the BB world d) provides grants e) enables members to work together
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2020: CIO registration
- 10 August 2021: Funds received from 275036 GLOBAL FELLOWSHIP OF CHRISTIAN YOUTH
- THE BOYS' BRIGADE - INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Pang | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Kim Koch Rasmussen | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Khareem Perry | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kamphata Botha | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Martin | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £34.03k | £40.40k | £35.50k | £43.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £34.80k | £74.34k | £60.04k | £59.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Mar 2020 as amended on 13 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRIST’S KINGDOM, THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE YOUTH OF THE WORLD BY SERVING AND SUPPORTING MEMBER ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
120 Broadsands Avenue
PAIGNTON
Devon
TQ4 6JW
- Phone:
- 0
- Email:
- admin@globalfellowship.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window