SURPLUS TO SUPPER TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Surplus to Supper is a charity working locally, with a mission statement to bridge the gap between food waste and food poverty. We take surplus food from across the food industry and provide it to local front-line charities and community groups and therefore provide relief to people who are in need by reason of age, ill health, disability, financial hardship and social circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £65,971 from 3 government contract(s) and £65,971 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
230 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 April 2020: CIO registration
- 25 February 2025: Funds received from 1188704 COOK4CARE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW OSBORNE | Chair | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Peter Mountford | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Marke | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ward Morden | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Markku Henrik Koppinen | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Monica Fleischer Jones | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.84k | £168.69k | £296.56k | £290.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.20k | £159.55k | £234.04k | £261.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £65.97k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.15k | £52.90k | £47.95k | £65.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Apr 2020 as amended on 26 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE IN SURREY AND LONDON WHO ARE IN NEED, BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SURPLUS FOOD AND OTHER ESSENTIAL ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 The Avenue
SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
TW16 5EX
- Phone:
- 07774625824
- Email:
- info@surplustosupper.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window