PONTYPRIDD CHRISTIAN CONCERN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY WAS SET UP TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY ENCOURAGING CHRISTIANS TO THINK BIBLICALLY AND TO APPLY BIBLICAL PRINCIPLES TO EVERY ASPECT IN LIFE, BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY WORK AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Paraguay
- Uganda
Governance
- 20 June 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Howard Smith | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MICHAEL SOUTHGATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF LLOYD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.95k | £53.70k | £29.52k | £21.03k | £20.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.62k | £76.98k | £31.36k | £32.13k | £32.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £21.68k | £4.62k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADDOPTED 4 AUGUST 1981 AS AMENDED 23 MAY 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY ENCOURAGING CHRISTIANS THO THINK BIBLICALLY AND TO APPLY BIBLICAL PRINCIPLES TO EVERY ASPECT OF LIFE, BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY WORK AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. (FOR FURTHER DATAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Ralph Street
PONTYPRIDD
Mid Glamorgan
CF37 4RS
- Phone:
- 01443407983
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window