Financial history PAKISTAN MOSQUE COMMITTEE AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity Number: 515278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £111.22k £165.61k £122.61k £186.52k £223.49k
Total expenditure £106.97k £127.41k £151.72k £188.45k £179.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.40k N/A N/A N/A