SAINT CALINIC FROM CERNICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity will organise masses, will promote the doctrines and canons of the Orthodox Christian religion. In addition, the organisation will raise funds to help those in need. The trustees will analyse and decide which cases have priority in providing financial support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ovidiu Severian Semerean | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mihai Teleaga | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marius Mirel Grumazescu Mr | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.21k | £88.91k | £120.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.72k | £9.03k | £21.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN HAMPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND THE CANONS OF THE ROMANIAN ORTHODOX PATRIARCHATE AND WITH THE STATUTES OF THE ROMANIAN ORTHODOX METROPOLIS OF WESTERN AND SOUTHERN EUROPE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING A PLACE OF WORSHIP, RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, AND CARRYING OUT RELIGIOUS ACTS, MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Millbrook Road West
Millbrook
Southampton
Hampshire
SO15 0JZ
- Phone:
- 07703671507
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window