THE HENRY COVENTRY ALMSHOUSES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide housing for people over 55 years of age, who are in financial need and have a strong connection to Droitwich.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 22 March 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Giles Morrison Joiner | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yolanda Vania Coulter | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA MARY BROOKES | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Allan Howard | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM THOMAS MOY | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA JENNIFER HAWKINS | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
GORDON ROBERT BROOKES | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £148.41k | £258.64k | £257.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £200.82k | £215.82k | £195.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £200 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: I) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING SOCIAL HOUSING, IN THE FORM OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION, FOR PERSONS WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 55 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ACCOMMODATION DUE TO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR LIMITED FINANCIAL RESOURCES, AND WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSION) HAVE RESIDED IN THE BOROUGH OF DROITWICH FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT. II) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Linked charities
- 22 March 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
38a Coventry Homes
The Holloway
DROITWICH
WR9 8HB
- Phone:
- 01905779599
- Email:
- admin@hcac.org.uk
- Website:
-
coventrycharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window