CHARITY BUDDY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing the following: -Pro bono business and creative support to animal charities and related voluntary sector organisations -Sanctuary care and rehoming support for geriatric animals in Surrey -Rewilding of a 30-acre site in Surrey -Implementing a national pet rehoming and adoption platform, PetRehomer.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 April 2020: CIO registration
- PetRehomer (Working name)
- PerRehomer (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colleen Alma Long MCIPD | Chair | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Raymond Carr | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNINE ANNE SATCHELL | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLIE ANN GRIFFITHS FCIPD | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.90k | £13.79k | £40.75k | £86.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.90k | £10.25k | £19.78k | £61.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Apr 2020 as amended on 27 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF ANIMAL CHARITIES AND THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: I. PROVIDING A FORUM TO EXCHANGE INFORMATION BETWEEN PEOPLE WITH BUSINESS SKILLS AND CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS, AND THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR, WHOSE OBJECTIVES ARE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE. II. TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WHOSE OBJECTIVES ARE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE. III. TO PROVIDE ACCESS TO A RANGE OF FREE BUSINESS TOOLS AND TECHNOLOGY THAT WILL HELP ANIMAL CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IMPROVE THEIR EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS, THEREFORE IMPROVING THEIR ABILITY TO DELIVER THEIR SERVICES TO ADVANCE ANIMAL WELFARE IV. PROVIDING AN ONLINE DIRECTORY THAT WILL BENEFIT THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY ENABLING THEM TO EASILY SEARCH FOR PETS THAT ARE BEING REHOMED BY CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ANIMAL RESCUE ORGANISATIONS. THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR’ MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. • CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES. • VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 3.2 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS 3.3 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL AND PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT OF AN UNIMPROVED PASTURE SITE IN SURREY, ENGLAND USING THE PROCESS OF REWILDING TO RESTORE BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY AND ECOSYSTEMS. 3.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND THE ENGAGEMENT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE RESTORATION, REHABILITATION, CONSERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS AND DISSEMINATE FINDINGS TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maple Farm
Rosemary Lane
Alfold
CRANLEIGH
GU6 8EZ
- Phone:
- 07387 554568
- Email:
- info@charitybuddy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window