LINK ANGOLA NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help and assist poor people mainly children's, in Angola Africa province of Kuite Bie, but, we also help communities in Northeast of England, we are also working partnership with local authorities. hospitals, association we receives donation from the public and local companies, food, used, cloths, shoes, money if necessary, disposable material for hospitals such as; needles, syringes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
- Sunderland
- Angola
Governance
- 11 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andjev Goncalves Da Cruz | Chair | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Celio Vasconcelo | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Augusto Simao Pereira Da Costa | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jesus Felix Mota | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
TANIA RAMOS | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE FROM THE AFRICAN CONTINENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ANGOLA, THEIR FAMILY MEMBERS AND SUBSEQUENT GENERATIONS WHO ARE NOW RESIDENT IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, SOCIAL NETWORKS AND ACTIVITIES THAT INVOLVE THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. (2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE FROM THE AFRICAN CONTINENT IN THE CULTURAL HERITAGE OF PEOPLE FROM THE AFRICAN CONTINENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMAL EDUCATION. (3) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AMONG PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT RACES RESIDENT IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND. (4) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE RURAL COMMUNITIES OF SOUTHERN ANGOLA. (5) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE RURAL COMMUNITIES OF SOUTHERN ANGOLA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 SALLYPORT CRESCENT
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 2NE
- Phone:
- 07340153272
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window