SOUTH WEST LONDON ISLAMIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to educate, engage and offer the best support to our community in South London in accordance to the Quran and Prophetic example as understood by the first 3 generations of pious Muslims, with sincerity, truthfulness and excellence. We run events to fight terrorism, support the vulnerable, give young paths to success, support single mothers & distributing zakat to the poor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
- Merton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 13 December 2019: Standard registration
- Markaz Abdullah Ibn Al Mubarak (Working name)
- SALAFI DAWAH TOOTING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tahir Chaudry | Chair | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Mitchell | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bourhan Ali | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Mahamud | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.68k | £712.01k | £345.95k | £103.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.60k | £712.02k | £172.82k | £246.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £712.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £8.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £703.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
TO FACILITATE THE WORSHIP FOR THE MUSLIM COMMUNTY. TO TEACH THE CORRECT UNDERSTANDING OF ISLAAM TO THE MUSLIMS & NON MUSLIMS, BY FREQUENT LESSONS AND OCCASIONAL CONFERENCES. FOR THE MALES & FEMALES YOUNG AND OLD. IN AND AROUND THE BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH, LAMBETH AND MERTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
182 Western Road
LONDON
CR4 3EB
- Phone:
- 07700 155 255
- Email:
- INFO@IBNMUBARAK.COM
- Website:
-
ibnmubarak.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window