CARMEL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The "old loved Hall" is a 19th century building offering modern facilities to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £2,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Flintshire
Governance
- 13 March 2020: CIO registration
- 15 May 2020: Funds received from 502926 CARMEL VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Sharp | Chair | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Carol Thomas | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mali Angharad Closs-Sharp | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Davies | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gayle Shacklady | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Roberts | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Russell Williams | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Dolphin | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heulwen Closs-Sharp | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.68k | £10.98k | £11.47k | £11.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.80k | £21.06k | £6.07k | £12.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.74k | N/A | N/A | £2.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF CARMEL IN THE COUNTY OF FLINT AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 FFORDD AELWYD
CARMEL
HOLYWELL
CH8 8SH
- Phone:
- 01352713415
- Email:
- chris_dolphin@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window