OPERATION INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives Education/training The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Ecuador
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- Philippines
- Uganda
Governance
- 07 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sala Abdalla | Chair | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Matin | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Watt | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £3.41k | £5.55k | £11.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £240 | £331 | £3.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2025 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2025 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 May 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE : 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, INCLUDING THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS, AMONGST UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROVIDING FREE SURGICAL AND MEDICAL CARE TO PATIENTS IN NEED OF SUCH CARE.; (B) TRAINING LOCAL MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS; AND (C) ASSISTING WITH THE DEVELOPMENT OF A SUSTAINABLE MEDICAL INFRASTRUCTURE. 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF CHILDREN LIVING IN UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN LIVING IN ORPHANAGES, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT. 3.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 7
35-37 Ludgate Hill
London
EC4M 7JN
- Phone:
- 07479534513
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window