NORTH MIDLANDS LGBT OLDER PEOPLES GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Group provides a local network that encourages and enables LGBT people to participate more effectively with the wider community; and works to increase, and co-ordinate opportunities for LGBT people to engage with service providers. We are a self-help group that offers mutual peer support in regular meetings and through programmes of social, cultural & creative activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 09 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAURICE ALFRED GREENHAM BA, LLCM | Chair | 20 July 2020 |
|
|||||
PAUL TIMOTHY SMITH | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joe Waring | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Colclough | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MALKIN | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.63k | £541 | £2.97k | £4.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.11k | £556 | £3.17k | £3.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR GENDER IDENTITY, GENDER EXPRESSION AND SEXUAL ORIENTATION (IN PARTICULAR LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANS PEOPLE) TO MEET THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO FULLY PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES LGBT PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; AND (B) INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR LGBT PEOPLE TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 LINLEY ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST4 6AX
- Phone:
- 07757750255
- Email:
- olgbt2009@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window