SIMPLE REASON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.1 To provide financial support among the victims of natural or other kind of disaster. 1.2 To advance the education of the public by providing grants, donations and services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Afghanistan
- Bangladesh
- India
- Pakistan
Governance
- 28 February 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUSSAIN AHMED | Chair | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mahbooba Sultana Quadir | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ASAD AHMED | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.31k | £21.84k | £50.61k | £101.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.23k | £30.76k | £38.17k | £130.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 31 December 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S/CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1.1 TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT AMONG THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KIND OF DISASTER. 1.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING GRANTS, DONATIONS AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 CASTALIA SQUARE
LONDON
E14 3PQ
- Phone:
- 07840086856
- Email:
- info.simplereason@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window