FREE THE FORGOTTEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FTF prepare and inspire a new generation of the youth for constructive engagement and by linking communities to discuss sustainable community safety and development whereas a sense of helplessness, exclusion, and desperation is eradicated. To build a stronger community surrounding the North West London area by offering a range of services including Educational/Employment/Housing and Wellbeing etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £24,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Somalia
Governance
- 06 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdillahi Mohamed | Chair | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anisa Mohamed | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zaki Elmi | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £36.93k | £88.44k | £70.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £36.53k | £84.67k | £55.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.31k | £24.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
220 Church Road
LONDON
NW10 9NP
- Phone:
- 02032730030
- Email:
- info@freetheforgotten.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window