LLANELLI WOMEN'S AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the relief of poverty, and the relief of mental and physical distress among women and children who have been maltreated by men with whom they live, by providing appropriate support, including where required, temporary accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 30 August 1984: Standard registration
- 20 January 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 January 2010: Funds transferred to 1124149 THRESHOLD DAS LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £373.33k | £374.03k | £372.60k | £403.70k | £444.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £297.71k | £366.98k | £345.44k | £391.28k | £397.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 23 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 19 August 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 08 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 31 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 05 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 07 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 07 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MAY 1984
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND THE RELIEF OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISTRESS AMONG WOMEN, WHO HAVE BEEN MALTREATED, BY THEIR HUSBANDS OR BY THE MEN WITH WHOM THEY ARE, OR HAVE BEEN LIVING AND AMONG THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN, BY THE PROVISION OF HSTEL ACCOMODATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window