JUNCTION ARTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company is the promotion and development of access and involvement in the arts through art and regeneration activity within the district of Bolsover.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £109,157 from 4 government contract(s) and £17,490 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 July 1984: Standard registration
- JUNCTION ARTS LIMITED (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Clarke | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Farhaanah Patel | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Chew | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jane Bowman | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Thorpe | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Ann Fomukong-Boden | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joby Parsons | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Wood | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Maycock | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £293.84k | £210.66k | £292.64k | £364.20k | £436.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.44k | £238.43k | £308.00k | £345.20k | £428.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.85k | £24.03k | £50.26k | N/A | £109.16k | |
|
Income from government grants | £131.78k | £141.13k | £168.06k | £31.20k | £17.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/03/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/09/1994 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/08/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/08/2011
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ARTS AND CULTURAL INDUSTRIES WITH THE OBJECT OF INCREASING PARTICIPATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS. 2. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS. 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AND INTEGRATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Studios
Sheffield Road
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S41 7LL
- Phone:
- 01246 209219
- Email:
- info@junctionarts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window