CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST HOLY SPIRIT PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, Christian religion, worship, prayer meeting, counseling, and such other activities that is charitable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 December 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kehinde Franklin Adekunle | Chair | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Demilade Omolayo Adekunle | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Regina Okoro | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.93k | £13.73k | £35.84k | £49.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.24k | £16.29k | £31.45k | £42.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 APR 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE MOUNTING OF SERVICES OF WORSHIP, PRAYER MEETINGS, COUNSELLING AND SUCH OTHER ACTIVITY THAT IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS WILL ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 NURSERY DRIVE
CATCLIFFE
ROTHERHAM
S60 5SF
- Phone:
- 07417356714
- Email:
- demadekunle1975@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window