THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE CHURCH, TORQUAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Mags is a Jesus centred, Grace filled, Kingdom living community based in the heart of Torquay, welcoming people from all walks of life. The Living Room is our community cafe creating a safe place, particularly for the homeless, enabling us to signpost people to appropriate support organisations. Our Playroom welcomes over 50 children per week and we run various children's groups on Sundays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £42,817 from 5 government grant(s)
People

21 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Torbay
Governance
- 04 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Rathbone-Roberts | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julia Johnston | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Hammond | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Garner | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel May Miller | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Corderoy | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Pannell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Anthony Hughes | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Fraser | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Newcomb | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Fortune | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Hart | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edwina Corderoy | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Badcott | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cooper | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samuel Leach | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joy Payne | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Hamilton | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Petrina Jones | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL DELLER | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.64k | £146.63k | £147.63k | £167.66k | £240.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.81k | £155.38k | £146.49k | £183.46k | £183.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £35.03k | £42.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARY MAGDALENE PARISH CHURCH
CHURCH HALL
UNION STREET
TORQUAY
TQ1 4BX
- Phone:
- 01803211868
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window