HOPE BAPTIST CHURCH, PLYMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church exists to proclaim the gospel of Jesus Christ and to make Him known. Activities include the hosting of worship and teaching services, the provision of various activites for children and familes; also elderly people. In addtion the church provides outreach services into the community such as poverty relief in the provision of food to homeless and poorer families and debt advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 23 December 2019: CIO registration
- 21 October 2021: Funds received from 1127869 HOPE BAPTIST CHURCH, PLYMOUTH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Luke Mansfield | Chair | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Caird | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Kate Pavelle | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Lane | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TREVOR COLE | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Stephen Bush | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Beryl Knight | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Joy Dixon | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dymond | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Dixon | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Jopson | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.89k | £283.34k | £231.35k | £237.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.40k | £208.71k | £251.41k | £213.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hope Baptist Church
Peverell Park Road
PLYMOUTH
PL3 4QG
- Phone:
- 01752708090
- Email:
- office@hopebaptist.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window