COUND MOOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 515313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

"The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Cound Moor, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants."

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £5,399
Total expenditure: £4,652

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Carter Chair 06 February 2018
None on record
Josephine Bennett Trustee 28 February 2024
None on record
Gary Tudor-Smith Trustee 28 February 2024
None on record
Kathleen McCarthy Trustee 28 February 2024
None on record
Clare Hall Trustee 28 February 2024
None on record
Peter Davies Trustee 21 August 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.12k £12.97k £6.98k £4.69k £5.40k
Total expenditure £2.80k £3.95k £16.20k £5.53k £4.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.43k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cound Moor Village Hall
Cound Moor
Cound
SHREWSBURY
SY5 6BB
Phone:
07740583461