ELEVATE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To act as a resource in Christchurch and surrounding areas in Dorset and Hampshire by providing advice, assistance and helping children and young people from the ages of 3 years to 25 years. This will be done through: a) The provision of recreational and leisure activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life, in particular but not
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 June 2020: CIO registration
- 02 January 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 02 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1120017 Relationship and Family Therapy (RAFT) Ltd
- HELPING YOUNG MINDS (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.79k | £27.01k | £61.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21k | £9.95k | £50.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jun 2020 as amended on 24 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
1.TO ACT AS A RESOURCE IN CHRISTCHURCH AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN DORSET AND HAMPSHIRE BY PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE AGES OF 3 YEARS TO 25 YEARS. THIS WILL BE DONE THROUGH: A)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE TO DANCE, ART, THEATRE, FITNESS AND OTHER OUTDOOR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES. B)PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2.TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY POOR MENTAL HEALTH, IN CHRISTCHURCH AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN DORSET AND HAMPSHIRE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A)WORKING WITH SPECIALIST AGENCIES AND MENTAL HEALTH PROFESSIONALS TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING AND RELATED MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT; B)RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDING INFORMATION TO PEOPLE WITHIN THE COMMUNITY ABOUT MENTAL HEALTH ILLNESSES AND WAYS TO MAINTAIN GOOD MENTAL HEALTH; AND TO FURTHER BOTH PURPOSES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window